CA AB2151 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to veterans, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Veterans' homes: Redding: Fresno: funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-03-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-03-19 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2151&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2151_bill_20120223_introduced.html |