CA AB2151 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 26614.6 and 26614.7 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Counties: search or rescue: costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2151 WAGNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2151 Wagner By Correa (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2151 WAGNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2151 Wagner By Correa (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2151 WAGNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6102.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4463.). |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5005.) |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 26614.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 26614.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |