CA AB2152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18926.3 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalFresh.
Title
CalFresh: able-bodied adults without dependents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2152 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2152 Weber By Leyva (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2152 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2152 Weber By Leyva (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2152 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 6618.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 5519.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 5376.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18926.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5845 | Amended Code | Citation Text |