CA AB2152 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 122354.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Public health: prohibition on the retail sale of dogs, cats, and rabbits.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] |
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2152 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2152 Gloria et al. By Hill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2152 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2152 Gloria et al. By Hill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2152 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5337.). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4358.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2020-07-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4786.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 122354.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |