CA AB2159 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-05 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-05 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5105, 5110, 5115, 5120, 5125, 5200, and 5260 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: association governance: elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2159 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2159 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 2). |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 5105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |