CA AB2173 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 76000.10 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency medical air transportation providers: penalty
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Arambula [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Asm. Joe Coto [D] |
Asm. Mike Davis [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2173 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2173 Beall By Emmerson (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2173 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2173 Beall By Emmerson (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2173 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 65. Noes 10. Page 6684.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 7. Page 4838.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected August 27.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 5497.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 13). | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 13.) | |
2010-03-23 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |