CA AB2173 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 406 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: motorized bicycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2173 Bradford (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2173 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2173 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3930.). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4943.) |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21207.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 24016 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |