CA AB2173 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7201 of, and to amend and repeal Section 10261 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2173 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2173 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2173 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4434.). |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4506.) |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10261 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 7201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |