CA AB2184 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 388, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 388, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 16000.1 and 16100.1 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to business licenses.
Title
Business licenses.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2184 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2184 Chiu et al. By Lara (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2184 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2184 Chiu et al. By Lara (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2184 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 388, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 6498.). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 5442.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 10. Page 5409.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 17). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and P. & C.P. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 16000.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 16100.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |