CA AB2194 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 101990) to Part 6 of Division 101 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: program flexibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2194&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2194_bill_20100218_introduced.html |