CA AB2194 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4600.5, 4602, 4604, 4607, 4610, and 4621 of, to amend and repeal Section 4620 of, and to add Section 4603.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 51034 of the Government Code, relating to massage.
Title
California Massage Therapy Council: business of massage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2194 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2194 Salas By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2194 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2194 Salas By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2194 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6539.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5415.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4685.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 3504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4600.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4603.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4620 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4621 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51034 | Amended Code | Citation Text |