CA AB2194 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.8 (commencing with Section 20660) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to video games.
Title
Video games: microtransactions.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 20660 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2194 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2194 |