CA AB2196 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 20301 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Sections 100001.5, 100011, 100013, 100014, 100014.1, 100017, 100018, 100020, 100022, 100030, 100031, 100055, 100055.1, 100055.2, 100055.3, 100060, 100060.2, 100061, 100062.1, 100070, 100071, 100082, 100090, 100100, 100110, 100111, 100112, 100113, 100114, 100115, 100115.5, 100120, 100121, 100124, 100125, 100126, 100130, 100130.5, 100131, 100132, 100133, 100153, 100155, 100160, 100160.1, 100160.2, 100160.5, 100161, 100162, 100163, 100164, 100165, 100167, 100168, 100169, 100170, 100171, 100250, 100252, 100253, 100254, 100302, 100303, 100304, 100305, 100307, 100308, 100350, 100351, 100370, 100371, 100372, 100380, 100381, 100400, 100401, 100403, 100404, 100407, 100409, 100410, 100411, 100450, 100451, 100460, 100461, 100462, 100463, 100470, 100471, 100482, 100483, 100490, 100491, 100492, 100500, 100600, 100601, 100601.5, 100602, 100602.11, 100602.14, 100603, 100605, 100606, 100609, 100610, 100612, 100613, 100618, and 100619 of, to amend the headings of Article 1 (commencing with Section 100060), Article 2 (commencing with Section 100070), and Article 5 (commencing with Section 100100) of Chapter 4 of Part 12 of Division 10 of, to amend the headings of Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 100060) and Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 100110) of Part 12 of Division 10 of, to repeal Sections 100032, 100306, and 100309 of, and to repeal Article 2 (commencing with Section 100040) of Chapter 3 of Part 12 of Division 10 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2196 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2196 Low (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2196 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2196 Low (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2196 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5874.). |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4645.). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4689.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |