CA AB2206 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6254.1 of the Government Code, relating to public records.
Title
Public records: local agencies: exception to disclosure: peace officers.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27279.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 27279.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 6254.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |