CA AB2236 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 45127, 45128, 45132, 45180, 88026, 88027, 88040, and 88180 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
School employees: employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2236&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2236_bill_20120224_introduced.html |