CA AB2236 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1548, 1568.0822, 1569.49, 1596.99, and 1597.58 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to care facilities.
Title
Care facilities: civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2236 Maienschein By Beall (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2236 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2236 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2236 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2236 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6667.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6679.). |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4932.). |
2014-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (August 27). Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5230.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1548 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1568.0822 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.49 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.99 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1597.58 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11404.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |