CA AB2236 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21627 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to secondhand goods.
Title
Secondhand goods: tangible personal property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2236&sess=1516&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2236_bill_20160218_introduced.html |