CA AB2236 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3041 of, and to add Section 3041.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Optometry: certification to perform advanced procedures.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2236 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2236 Low By Skinner (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2236 Low By Skinner (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - [08-11-2022] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2236 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2236 Low By Skinner (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2236 Low By Skinner (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - [08-11-2022] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2236 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 41. Noes 11.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 5243.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4659.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 3041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3041.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |