CA AB2242 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44274 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Air Quality Improvement Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 40612 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44274 | Amended Code | Citation Text |