CA AB2244 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 12.3 (commencing with Section 108943) to Part 3 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to product safety.
Title
Product safety: proofs of purchase: intentionally added bisphenols.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2244 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2244 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 16.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 16). |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 108943 | New Code | See Bill Text |