CA AB2250 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 20037.14 and 20037.15 to the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement.
Title
Public employees' retirement: safety members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |