CA AB2250 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 68074.5 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: nonresident tuition:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-30 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2012-03-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27). | |
2012-03-22 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-03-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 68074.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |