CA AB2251 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51225.3 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Graduation requirements: local requirements: exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2251 Connolly Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2251 Connolly By Stern (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - AB 2251 Connolly Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2251 Connolly By Stern (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - AB 2251 Connolly Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4661.) |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51225.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |