CA AB2270 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6452.2 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Sales and use tax: use tax: administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2270 Harkey (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2270 HARKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2270 HARKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m. | |
2012-08-09 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-08-09 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4446.). | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-05-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4676.) | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-18 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-17 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6452.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |