CA AB2270 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18927 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
California Building Standards Commission: advisory panels.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2270 Ting By DeSaulnier (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2270 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2270 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-20 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4932.). |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator DeSaulnier. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5112.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18927 | Amended Code | Citation Text |