CA AB2270 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2191, 2811.5, 3524.5, 4980.54, 4989.34, 4996.22, and 4999.76 of, and to add Section 2914.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts: continuing education: menopausal mental or physical health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2270 Maienschein Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2270 Maienschein et al. By Limón (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2270 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2270 Maienschein et al. By Limón (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2270 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2811.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2914.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3524.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4989.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |