CA AB2277 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10608.26 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water conservation: urban retail water suppliers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-12 - Assembly - AB 2277 FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2277 Fletcher (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 2277 FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2277 Fletcher (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 2277 FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m. | |
2010-08-12 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6151.) | |
2010-08-05 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-05 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4375.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-16 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-06-03 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-04-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4820.) | |
2010-04-15 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14). | |
2010-03-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |