CA AB2277 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 87482.3 and 87482.5 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: part-time faculty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2277 Wallis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2277 Wallis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 87482.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87482.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |