CA AB2290 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3003 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
CDCR: inmates: summary parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2290 Bradford By Huff (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2290 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2290 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-08-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m. | |
2010-08-11 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4462.) | |
2010-08-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-03 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 2). | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5500.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-04-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |