CA AB2290 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-05 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-05 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 63021.5 of, and to add Section 63024.2 to, the Government Code, relating to economic development.
Title
California Infrastructure and Economic Development Bank.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2290 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2290 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 4958.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 7). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 63021.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63024.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |