CA AB2290 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1161.2 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 7060.6 of, and to add Section 7060.8 to, the Government Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Unlawful detainer: civil case records: reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7060.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7060.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |