CA AB2298 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33350, 51210.1, and 51210.2 of, and to add Section 51220.7 to, the Education Code, relating to physical education.
Title
Education: physical education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2298 TORLAKSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2298 TORLAKSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-12 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). | |
2010-06-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 5522.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-14 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 7). | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-03-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |