CA AB2298 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 70615 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 186.34 of, and to add Section 186.35 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal gangs.
Title
Criminal gangs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2298 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2298 Weber By Mitchell (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2298 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2298 Weber By Mitchell (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2298 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 6384.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 5276.). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 34. Page 5196.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 7.) (May 27). |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 70615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |