CA AB2300 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 18 (commencing with Section 109050) to Part 3 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to product safety.
Title
Medical devices: Di-(2-ethylhexyl) phthalate (DEHP).
Sponsors
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2300 Wilson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2300 Wilson Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2300 Wilson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2300 Wilson Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1.) |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 55. Noes 11.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 109050 | New Code | See Bill Text |