CA AB2305 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20020, 20021, 20025, 20027, 20030, 20035, 20040, and 20040.5 of, to amend the heading of Article 6 (commencing with Section 20035) of Chapter 5.5 of Division 8 of, to add Sections 20000.5, 20028, 20038, 20039, and 20044 to, to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 20016) to Chapter 5.5 of Division 8 of, to repeal Section 20026 of, and to repeal and add Section 20036 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 31001, 31012, 31220, 31300, 31302, 31302.5, 31303, 31306, and 31512 of, to add Section 31110.5 to, to repeal Sections 31301 and 31304 of, and to repeal and add Section 31201 of, the Corporations Code, relating to franchises.
Title
Franchises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2012-04-24 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |