CA AB2316 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 49431, 49431.2, 49431.5, 49501.5, and 49531 of the Education Code, relating to pupil nutrition.
Title
Pupil nutrition: substances: prohibition.
Sponsors
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Avelino Valencia [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Asm. Akilah Weber [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2316 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2316 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2024-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49431 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49431.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49431.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49501.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49531 | Amended Code | Citation Text |