CA AB2368 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 86203 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: gift limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Set third hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 6). | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |