CA AB2368 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38000 of the Education Code, relating to school security.
Title
School security: security departments: school police
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Assembly - AB 2368 BLOCK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2368 Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 2368 BLOCK Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2368 Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 2368 BLOCK Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:20 p.m. | |
2012-07-02 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5554.). | |
2012-06-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-06-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4181.). | |
2012-06-21 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |
2012-06-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-06-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-04-30 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4600.) | |
2012-04-25 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-24 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-23 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 38000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |