CA AB2370 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 87359.2 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: faculty: instructor of record: qualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2370 Cervantes (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2370 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2370 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-06-25 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 87359.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |