CA AB2388 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 35159 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the Santa Clara County Open-Space Authority.
Title
Santa Clara County Open-Space Authority: authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2388 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2388 Beall By Alquist (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-05 - Assembly - AB 2388 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB2388 Beall By Alquist (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2388 BEALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2388 Beall By Alquist (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-05 - Assembly - AB 2388 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB2388 Beall By Alquist (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2388 BEALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6115.). | |
2012-08-20 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4584.). | |
2012-08-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-13 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-06 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2012-08-06 | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments and whereby the bill was ordered to enrollment. Ordered returned to Senate. | |
2012-07-05 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5601.). | |
2012-07-02 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-07-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4225.). | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4786.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and B., P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 35159 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23609 | Amended Code | Citation Text |