CA AB2389 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11139.8 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: state employees: travel.
Sponsors
Asm. Matthew Harper [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11139.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |