CA AB2414 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 215, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 215, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14678 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Parking facilities: electric vehicle charging.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2414 Ting By De Le (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2414 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2414 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 215, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4301.). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 4833.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 29). |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14678 | Amended Code | Citation Text |