CA AB2415 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 18937, 18938, and 18939 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 10.3 (commencing with Section 18937) of Part 6 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Cash assistance for aged, blind, and disabled immigrants.
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Carrillo [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] |
Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18937 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18938 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18939 | New Code | See Bill Text |