CA AB2441 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 32210 and 48902 of the Education Code, relating to school safety.
Title
School safety: mandatory notifications.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] |
Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. Caroline Menjivar [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Lola Smallwood-Cuevas [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2441 Kalra et al. By Bradford Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2441 Kalra et al. By Bradford (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2441 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2441 Kalra et al. By Bradford (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2441 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez. |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Bradford. |
2024-08-29 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 14.). | |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). |
2024-06-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 22. Page 5649.) |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 22.) |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (May 15). |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |