CA AB2447 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21083.9 and 21092 of, and to add Chapter 2.8 (commencing with Section 21099.50) to Division 13 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to land use.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: land use: environmental justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2447 REYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2447 Reyes et al. By Lara (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2447 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2447 Reyes et al. By Lara (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2447 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 30. Page 7031.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5995.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 5554.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21083.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21092 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21099.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |