CA AB2460 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2861, 2863, 2864, 2865, 2866, 2867, and 2867.3 of, to amend and renumber Section 2862 of, to repeal Sections 2860, 2867.1, and 2867.2 of, and to repeal and add Section 2867.4 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Solar thermal systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2460 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2460 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5195.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27). |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 13). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2860 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2861 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2863 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2864 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2865 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2866 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2867 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2867.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2867.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2867.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2867.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |