CA AB2473 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44256 and 44274.2 of, to add Section 51225.25 to, and to repeal Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 420) of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, and to repeal Section 143 of Chapter 44 of the Statutes of 2021, relating to pupil instruction, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
English Language Learner Acquisition and Development Pilot Program repeal: teacher credentialing authorizations: high school coursework and graduation requirements for pupils participating in a newcomer program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2473 Education Assembly Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2473 Education Assembly Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 420 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44256 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44274.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51225.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |