CA AB2478 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 626.8 of the Penal Code, relating to school safety.
Title
School safety: disruption threatening pupil's immediate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2478 MENDOZA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2478 Mendoza By Cedillo (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2478 MENDOZA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2478 Mendoza By Cedillo (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2478 MENDOZA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 6478.) | |
2010-08-19 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4683.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-23 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-04-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-26 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 4857.) | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-07 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |
2010-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |