CA AB248 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 797, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 797, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14670.1 and 20405 of the Government Code, to amend Section 1267.11 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 14110.6, 19008.5, 19502, 19503, 19504, and 19725 of, and to repeal Section 4509 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to individuals with disabilities.
Title
Individuals with disabilities: The Dignity for All Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 248 Mathis Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB248 Mathis et al. By Limón (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Assembly - AB 248 Mathis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB248 Mathis et al. By Limón (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Assembly - AB 248 Mathis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 797, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3277.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.) |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2548.). |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2023-05-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 741.) |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-01-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14670.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1267.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14110.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19008.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19725 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4509 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |