CA AB2482 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.7 (commencing with Section 5700) to Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 13401 of the Corporations Code, and to amend Section 26509 of the Government Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Registered interior designers.
Sponsors
Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5700 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 13401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |